Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Godofredo Pedernal Pisig

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Borongan, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Nov 1915Born
30 Apr 194428.4Ordained PriestPriest
26 Feb 196852.3AppointedBishop of Borongan, Philippines
18 May 196852.5Ordained BishopBishop of Borongan, Philippines
18 Sep 197660.8ResignedBishop of Borongan, Philippines
25 Nov 200085.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Borongan, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Godofredo Pedernal Pisig
Bishop Godofredo Pedernal Pisig (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Borongan

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Cruz
Ordained BishopSaint Ferdinand, Cathedral, Lucena, Diocese of Lucena

  • a priest for 56.5 years
  • a bishop for 32.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 11, Number 516
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 73, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast