Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Borongan

Dioecesis Boronganensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 22 October 1960
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Palo
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Philippines
  • Square Kilometers: 4,641 (1,792 Square Miles)
  • Description: Eastern Samar
  • Official Web Site: http://borongandiocese.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's Residence, Borongan City, 6800 Eastern Samar, Philippines
  • Telephone: (055)560-9325
  • Fax: 261-3317

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
22 October 1960ErectedDiocese of Calbayog Diocese of Borongan (erected)
5 December 1974Territory LostDiocese of Borongan
Diocese of Calbayog
Diocese of Catarman (erected)
15 November 1982Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Borongan (from Cebu)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
1970358,203388,30492.2%44448,1402334ap1971
1980304,831311,05398.0%351368,46711928ap1981
1990431,216448,44996.2%3423611,97823127ap1991
1999398,053427,05393.2%485537,51053629ap2000
2000398,053427,05393.2%495547,37153329ap2001
2001398,053427,05393.2%495547,37153629ap2002
2002398,053427,05393.2%425478,46953529ap2003
2003398,522427,05393.3%455507,97053529ap2004
2004398,552427,05393.3%425478,47952930ap2005
2006414,000442,00093.7%525577,26353330ap2007
2012465,000496,00093.8%616676,94066332ap2013
2015490,000522,00093.9%666726,80566532ap2016

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_d, v3.2.2, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jul 2018

Quantcast