Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angel T. Hobayan

Bishop Emeritus of Catarman


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Dec 1929 BornTaft
25 Mar 195525.3Ordained PriestPriest
12 Dec 197445.0AppointedBishop of Catarman, Philippines
5 Mar 197545.2Ordained BishopBishop of Catarman, Philippines
11 Mar 197545.3InstalledBishop of Catarman, Philippines
10 Mar 200575.2RetiredBishop of Catarman, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Angel T. Hobayan:
Bishop Angel T. Hobayan (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Catarman

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Catarman.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013