Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Sincero Barcenilla Lucero

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Calbayog, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1935Born
18 Mar 196125.2Ordained PriestPriest
8 Mar 197741.2AppointedBishop of Borongan, Philippines
24 May 197741.4Ordained BishopBishop of Borongan, Philippines
10 Dec 197943.9AppointedBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
11 Oct 198448.8ResignedBishop of Calbayog, Philippines
3 Sep 199357.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Calbayog, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Sincero Barcenilla Lucero
Bishop Sincero Barcenilla Lucero (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Calbayog

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCarcar
Ordained BishopCathedral, Cebu, Archdiocese of Cebu

  • a priest for 32.4 years
  • a bishop for 16.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 57, Number 4,250

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast