Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Cesare Cardinal Zerba

Deceased

Secretary Emeritus of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments

Cardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora del Sacro Cuore

Priest of Roma {Rome}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1892BornCastelnuovo Scrivia, Italy
4 Jul 191523.2Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
18 Dec 195866.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
28 Aug 196270.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
21 Sep 196270.4Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Colossae {Rhodes}
22 Feb 196572.8Elevated to Cardinal
22 Feb 196572.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora del Sacro Cuore
22 Feb 196572.8ResignedSecretary of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments
11 Jul 197381.2DiedSecretary Emeritus of the Congregation of the Discipline of the Sacraments

MicroData Summary for Cesare Zerba:
Cesare Cardinal Zerba (born , died ) Secretary Emeritus of Discipline of the Sacraments

  • a priest for 58.0 years
  • a bishop for 10.8 years
  • a cardinal for 8.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1962, Number 149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014