Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Beniamino Nardone

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation of Ceremonies

Titular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Nov 1877Born
20 Sep 190123.8Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jun 192648.6AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Ceremonies
28 Aug 196284.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
21 Sep 196284.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aureliopolis in Asia
19 Feb 196385.2DiedSecretary of the Congregation of Ceremonies

MicroData Summary for Beniamino Nardone
Archbishop Beniamino Nardone (born , died ) Secretary of Ceremonies

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGravina di Puglia, Italy

  • a priest for 61.4 years
  • a bishop for .4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1963
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 152

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast