Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Ambrogio Marchioni

Deceased

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Switzerland

Titular Archbishop of Severiana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Aug 1911Born
26 May 193422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Napoli {Naples}, Italy
1 Jul 195947.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to El Salvador
1 Jul 195947.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Guatemala
14 Oct 196150.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Severiana
12 Nov 196150.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Severiana
1 Sep 196453.0AppointedOfficial of the Secretariat of State
30 Jun 196755.8AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
Sep 198473.0ResignedApostolic Nuncio to Switzerland
27 Feb 198977.4DiedApostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Switzerland

MicroData Summary for Ambrogio Marchioni
Archbishop Ambrogio Marchioni (born , died ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Switzerland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNapoli, Italy

  • a priest for 54.7 years
  • a bishop for 27.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast