Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Enrico Cardinal Dante

Deceased

Secretary of the Congregation of Rites

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Jul 1884BornRome
3 Jul 191026.0Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
5 Jan 196075.5AppointedSecretary of the Congregation of Rites
28 Aug 196278.1AppointedTitular Archbishop of Carpasia
21 Sep 196278.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Carpasia
22 Feb 196580.6Elevated to Cardinal
25 Feb 196580.6AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
24 Apr 196782.8DiedSecretary of the Congregation of Rites

MicroData Summary for Enrico Dante:
Cardinal Enrico Dante (born , died ) Secretary of Rites

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 4.6 years
  • a cardinal for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1962, Number 148

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 21 Jan 2014