Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pasquale (Amato) Pagnucci, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}

Titular Bishop of Agathonice


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1833BornRuota, Italy
1852¹18.2ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
29 Sep 185623.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
15 Apr 186733.5AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi), China
15 Apr 186733.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathonice
31 May 186733.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathonice
12 Apr 188450.5SucceededVicar Apostolic of Scen-Si (Chen-si, Shensi), China
6 Jul 188753.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}, China
1 Feb 190167.3DiedVicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}, China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pasquale (Amato) Pagnucci:
Bishop Pasquale (Amato) Pagnucci O.F.M. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Northern Shensi {Scen-Si Settentrionale}

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 33.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 80

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013