Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Oscar Páez Garcete

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Alto Paraná, Paraguay


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Sep 1937Born
23 Dec 196124.3Ordained PriestPriest
5 Jun 197840.7AppointedBishop of San Pedro, Paraguay
19 Aug 197840.9Ordained BishopBishop of San Pedro, Paraguay
10 Jul 199355.8AppointedBishop of Alto Paraná, Paraguay
5 Feb 200062.4ResignedBishop of Alto Paraná, Paraguay
29 Mar 201678.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Alto Paraná, Paraguay

MicroData Summary for Oscar Páez Garcete
Bishop Oscar Páez Garcete (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Alto Paraná

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLoreto

  • a priest for 54.2 years
  • a bishop for 37.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB, 29 Mar 2016
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast