Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Reginald Joseph Orsmond

Deceased

Bishop of Johannesburg


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1931BornJohannesburg
8 Dec 195423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Johannesburg, South Africa
27 Jan 198352.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Johannesburg, South Africa
27 Jan 198352.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Assuras
14 May 198352.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Assuras
2 Jul 198453.5AppointedBishop of Johannesburg, South Africa
19 May 200271.3DiedBishop of Johannesburg, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Reginald Joseph Orsmond:
Bishop Reginald Joseph Orsmond (born , died ) Bishop of Johannesburg

  • a priest for 47.4 years
  • a bishop for 19.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013