Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Orlando

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1895BornTorre Annunziata
30 Mar 191823.1Ordained PriestPriest
4 Sep 194247.5AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
18 Oct 194247.7Ordained BishopBishop of San Severo, Italy
2 Aug 196065.4DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Orlando:
Bishop Francesco Orlando (born , died ) Bishop of San Severo

  • a priest for 42.3 years
  • a bishop for 17.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1942, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013