Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Maria di Girolamo

Deceased

Bishop of Caiazzo, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1880Born
19 Sep 190323.0Ordained PriestPriest
16 Aug 192241.9AppointedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
15 Oct 192242.0Ordained BishopBishop of Caiazzo, Italy
5 Jul 196382.8DiedBishop of Caiazzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Nicola Maria di Girolamo
Bishop Nicola Maria di Girolamo (born , died ) Bishop of Caiazzo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFossalto

  • a priest for 59.7 years
  • a bishop for 40.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1,939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1,922, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast