Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michele Rateni

Deceased

Bishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Feb 1901Born
24 Aug 192423.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jun 194544.3AppointedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
19 Aug 194544.5Ordained BishopBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy
7 Jul 195352.4DiedBishop of San Marco e Bisignano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Michele Rateni
Bishop Michele Rateni (born , died ) Bishop of San Marco e Bisignano

EventPlace
Birth PlacePetrella Tifernina

  • a priest for 28.8 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 45

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast