Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Lorenzo Gargiulo

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Gaeta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Oct 1904BornTorre Annunziata
12 Mar 192722.4Ordained PriestPriest of Nola, Italy
4 Oct 194742.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Gaeta, Italy
4 Oct 194742.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Germa in Hellesponto
23 Nov 194743.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Germa in Hellesponto
24 Feb 196661.3SucceededArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
26 Jan 197368.2ResignedArchbishop of Gaeta, Italy
11 May 197469.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Gaeta, Italy

MicroData Summary for Lorenzo Gargiulo:
Archbishop Lorenzo Gargiulo (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Gaeta

  • a priest for 47.1 years
  • a bishop for 26.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1947, Number 124

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015