Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leo Edward O’Neil

Deceased

Bishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jan 1928Born
4 Jun 195527.3Ordained PriestPriest of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
30 Jun 198052.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
30 Jun 198052.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Bencenna
22 Aug 198052.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bencenna
17 Oct 198961.7AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
12 Jun 199062.3SucceededBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
30 Nov 199769.8DiedBishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA

MicroData Summary for Leo Edward O’Neil
Bishop Leo Edward O’Neil (born , died ) Bishop of Manchester

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHolyoke

  • a priest for 42.4 years
  • a bishop for 17.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017