Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Christopher Joseph Weldon

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Sep 1905Born
21 Sep 192924.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jan 195044.3AppointedBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
24 Mar 195044.5Ordained BishopBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
15 Oct 197772.1ResignedBishop of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA
19 Mar 198276.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Springfield in Massachusetts, USA

MicroData Summary for Christopher Joseph Weldon
Bishop Christopher Joseph Weldon (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Springfield in Massachusetts

EventPlace
Birth PlaceNew York, NY

  • a priest for 52.4 years
  • a bishop for 31.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 12

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Jan 2017