Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francis Joseph Christian

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA

Titular Bishop of Quincy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Oct 1942 Born
29 Jun 196825.7Ordained PriestPriest of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
2 Apr 199653.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA
2 Apr 199653.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Quincy
14 May 199653.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Quincy
1 Feb 201875.3RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Manchester, New Hampshire, USA

MicroData Summary for Francis Joseph Christian
Bishop Francis Joseph Christian (born ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Manchester

EventPlace
Birth PlacePeterborough, Diocese of Manchester, New Hampshire
Ordained PriestSaint Patrick, Church, Jaffrey, Diocese of Manchester, New Hampshire
Ordained BishopSaint Joseph, Cathedral, Manchester, Diocese of Manchester, New Hampshire

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Manchester.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 145, Number 12,720
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Feb 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast