Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Oscar de Oliveira

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Mariana, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jan 1912BornEntre Rios de Minas
27 Oct 193523.7Ordained PriestPriest of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
25 May 195442.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Pouso Alegre, Brazil
25 May 195442.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
22 Aug 195442.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Irenopolis in Cilicia
31 Jan 195947.0AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
31 Jan 195947.0AppointedTitular Archbishop of Rhoina
25 Apr 196048.2SucceededArchbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
6 Apr 198876.2RetiredArchbishop of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil
24 Feb 199785.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Mariana, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Oscar de Oliveira:
Archbishop Oscar de Oliveira (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Mariana

  • a priest for 61.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015