Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Thomas McGovern

Deceased

Bishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1832Born
27 Dec 186129.7Ordained PriestPriest of Philadelphia, Pennsylvania, USA
9 Jan 188855.7AppointedBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
11 Mar 188855.9Ordained BishopBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA
25 Jul 189866.2DiedBishop of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania, USA

MicroData Summary for Thomas McGovern
Bishop Thomas McGovern (born , died ) Bishop of Harrisburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSwanlinbar, Diocese of Kilmore, Ireland
Ordained BishopCathedral, Harrisburg, Diocese of Harrisburg, Pennsylvania

  • a priest for 36.5 years
  • a bishop for 10.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 299
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1888, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 10 Jun 2017