Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrick MacAlister

Deceased

Bishop of Down and Connor, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1826²Born
18 Sep 185226.7Ordained PriestPriest
26 Feb 188660.1AppointedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
28 Mar 188660.2Ordained BishopBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland
26 Mar 189569.2DiedBishop of Down and Connor, Ireland

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Patrick MacAlister (VIAF: 1185772)
Bishop Patrick MacAlister (born 1826, died ) Bishop of Down and Connor

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBonecastle
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Belfast

  • a priest for 42.5 years
  • a bishop for 8.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Catholic Encyclopedia
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 254
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1886, Number 11

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 20 May 2017