Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard O’Kane

Deceased

Bishop of Derry, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1867Born
18 May 189124.3Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jun 192659.4AppointedBishop of Derry, Ireland
26 Sep 192659.7Ordained BishopBishop of Derry, Ireland
5 Jan 193972.0DiedBishop of Derry, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Bernard O’Kane
Bishop Bernard O’Kane (born , died ) Bishop of Derry

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGarvagh

  • a priest for 47.6 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1926, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast