Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antonio Yapsutco Fortich

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bacolod, Philippines


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1913Born
4 Mar 194430.5Ordained PriestPriest
13 Jan 196753.4AppointedBishop of Bacolod, Philippines
24 Feb 196753.5Ordained BishopBishop of Bacolod, Philippines
31 Jan 198975.4RetiredBishop of Bacolod, Philippines
2 Jul 200389.8DiedBishop Emeritus of Bacolod, Philippines

MicroData Summary for Antonio Yapsutco Fortich
Bishop Antonio Yapsutco Fortich (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bacolod

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDumaguete

  • a priest for 59.3 years
  • a bishop for 36.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 173, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast