Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Augustine O’Daly, O.S.A. †

Deceased

Bishop of Kilfenora


Events

DateEventTitle
17 Jul 1726SelectedBishop of Kilfenora, Ireland
27 Jul 1726ConfirmedBishop of Kilfenora, Ireland
6 Oct 1726Ordained BishopBishop of Kilfenora, Ireland
20 Aug 1749DiedBishop of Kilfenora, Ireland

MicroData Summary for James Augustine O’Daly
Bishop James Augustine O’Daly O.S.A. (died ) Bishop of Kilfenora

  • a bishop for 22.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 202
  • ob/c2+: CB, 23 Jul 2014
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1726, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 17 Feb 2016