Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jabulani Adatus Nxumalo, O.M.I.

Archbishop of Bloemfontein, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jan 1944 Born
2 Sep 197430.5Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
8 Jul 200258.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Durban, South Africa
8 Jul 200258.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ficus
25 Aug 200258.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ficus
10 Oct 200561.7AppointedArchbishop of Bloemfontein, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Jabulani Adatus Nxumalo
Archbishop Jabulani Adatus Nxumalo O.M.I. (born ) Archbishop of Bloemfontein

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDurban

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Bloemfontein.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2005
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Number 14,242

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 1 Sep 2017