Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Peter Holiday

Bishop of Kroonstad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jan 1952 BornDurban
10 Dec 199240.9Ordained PriestPriest of Johannesburg, South Africa
1 Apr 201159.2AppointedBishop of Kroonstad, South Africa
25 Jun 201159.5Ordained BishopBishop of Kroonstad, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Peter Holiday:
Bishop Peter Holiday (born ) Bishop of Kroonstad

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kroonstad.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 25 Jun 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,081

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013