Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Barry Alexander Anthony Wood, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Durban, South Africa

Titular Bishop of Babra


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jun 1942Born
196522.5ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
14 Jul 196826.0Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
10 Oct 200563.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Durban, South Africa
10 Oct 200563.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Babra
26 Feb 200663.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Babra
2 May 201774.8DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Durban, South Africa

MicroData Summary for Barry Alexander Anthony Wood
Bishop Barry Alexander Anthony Wood O.M.I. (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Durban

EventPlace
Birth PlacePort Elisabeth
Death PlaceDurban, Archdiocese of Durban

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 11.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,077
  • d: CB, 2 May 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 May 2017