Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Paul Mandla Khumalo, C.M.M.

Archbishop Emeritus of Pretoria, South Africa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Feb 1947 Born
28 Apr 197326.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Mariannhill Missionaries
2 Oct 200154.6AppointedBishop of Witbank, South Africa
27 Jan 200254.9Ordained BishopBishop of Witbank, South Africa
24 Nov 200861.8AppointedArchbishop of Pretoria, South Africa
24 Nov 200861.8AppointedBishop of South Africa, Military
15 Dec 200962.8ResignedArchbishop of Pretoria, South Africa
15 Dec 200962.8ResignedBishop of South Africa, Military

MicroData Summary for Paul Mandla Khumalo
Archbishop Paul Mandla Khumalo C.M.M. (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Pretoria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSt. Wendelin

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Pretoria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Nov 2008
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,123

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast