Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Witbank

Dioecesis Vitbankensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Giuseppe Sandri, M.C.C.I., Bishop

General Information

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Lydenburg
12 June 1923ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Transvaal Prefecture Apostolic of Lydenburg (erected)
Vicariate Apostolic of Lydenburg
9 December 1948ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Lydenburg Vicariate Apostolic of Lydenburg
Diocese of Lydenburg
11 January 1951ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Lydenburg Diocese of Lydenburg
23 June 1958Territory LostDiocese of Bremersdorp
Archdiocese of Durban
Diocese of Lydenburg
Prefecture Apostolic of Volksrust (erected)
Diocese of Lydenburg-Witbank
13 September 1964Name ChangedDiocese of Lydenburg Diocese of Lydenburg-Witbank
Diocese of Witbank
10 November 1987Name ChangedDiocese of Lydenburg-Witbank Diocese of Witbank
5 June 2007Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Witbank (from Pretoria)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Lydenburg
19507,650795,0001.0%3030255186114ap1951
Diocese of Lydenburg
Diocese of Lydenburg-Witbank
197030,5001,060,0002.9%63945677609522ap1971
198077,0001,310,0005.9%630362,138499520ap1981
Diocese of Witbank
1990156,5002,300,0006.8%720275,79610289020ap1991
1999105,0002,585,0004.1%1126372,8379316320ap2000
2000105,0002,642,0004.0%1224362,9168276220ap2001
2001105,0002,461,0004.3%1424382,7638276220ap2002
2002105,0002,461,0004.3%1324372,8378276120ap2003
2003105,0002,461,0004.3%1322353,0007246120ap2004
2004103,2782,528,0004.1%1625412,5188266220ap2005
2010106,9002,674,0004.0%1717343,1445175222ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013