Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph Mopeli Sephamola, O.M.I.

Bishop of Qacha’s Nek, Lesotho


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1960 Born
6 Jan 198423.8ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
25 Jan 198928.8Solemn VowsMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
27 Apr 199131.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
19 Jun 201353.2AppointedBishop of Qacha’s Nek, Lesotho
21 Sep 201353.5Ordained BishopBishop of Qacha’s Nek, Lesotho

MicroData Summary for Joseph Mopeli Sephamola
Bishop Joseph Mopeli Sephamola O.M.I. (born ) Bishop of Qacha’s Nek

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTsoelike

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Qacha’s Nek.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2013
  • ob: CB, 18 Sep 2013
  • c2+: CB, 22 Sep 2013
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 215, Number 17,877

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast