Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Laurent Noël

Bishop Emeritus of Trois Rivières, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Mar 1920 Born
16 Jun 194424.2Ordained PriestPriest of Sainte-Anne-de-la-Pocatière, Québec, Canada
25 Jun 196343.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Québec, Canada
25 Jun 196343.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
29 Aug 196343.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Agathopolis
7 Sep 197454.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Hauterive, Québec, Canada
15 Aug 197555.4CeasedApostolic Administrator of Hauterive, Québec, Canada
8 Nov 197555.6AppointedBishop of Trois Rivières, Québec, Canada
13 Dec 197555.7InstalledBishop of Trois Rivières, Québec, Canada
21 Nov 199676.6RetiredBishop of Trois Rivières, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Laurent Noël
Bishop Laurent Noël (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Trois Rivières

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Just-de-Bretenières

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Trois Rivières.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1963

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast