Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martin Veillette

Bishop Emeritus of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Nov 1936 Born
12 Jun 196023.5Ordained PriestPriest of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada
17 Oct 198649.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada
17 Oct 198649.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Valabria
13 Dec 198650.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Valabria
21 Nov 199660.0AppointedBishop of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada
2 Feb 201275.2RetiredBishop of Trois-Rivières, Québec, Canada

MicroData Summary for Martin Veillette
Bishop Martin Veillette (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Trois-Rivières

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLa Tuque

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Trois-Rivières.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 2 Feb 2012
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 23 Jul 2018

Quantcast