Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Egidio Nkaijanabwo

Bishop Emeritus of Kasese, Uganda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1935 Born
28 May 196125.7Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 198953.5AppointedBishop of Kasese, Uganda
17 Jun 198953.8Ordained BishopBishop of Kasese, Uganda
15 Apr 201478.6RetiredBishop of Kasese, Uganda

MicroData Summary for Egidio Nkaijanabwo
Bishop Egidio Nkaijanabwo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Kasese

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRugazi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Kasese.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 117, Number 10,459
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 126
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast