Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Mbarara

Archidioecesis Mbararaensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Paul K. Bakyenga, Archbishop
  • Lambert Bainomugisha, Auxiliary Bishop
  • John Baptist Kakubi, Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 2 January 1999
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Uganda
  • Square Kilometers: 10,980 (4,241 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archdioceseofmbarara.org/
  • Mailing Address: Nyamitanga, P.O. Box 184, Mbarara, Uganda
  • Telephone: (0485)20.052
  • Fax: 21.249

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Ruwenzori
28 May 1934ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Uganda Vicariate Apostolic of Ruwenzori (erected)
Diocese of Mbarara
25 March 1953ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Ruwenzori Diocese of Mbarara
21 February 1961Territory LostDiocese of Mbarara Diocese of Fort Portal (erected)
1 February 1966Territory LostDiocese of Mbarara Diocese of Kabale (erected)
Archdiocese of Mbarara
2 January 1999ElevatedDiocese of Mbarara Archdiocese of Mbarara

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Ruwenzori
1950205,1211,146,67517.9%1554692,972716317ap1951
Diocese of Mbarara
1970211,625855,15524.7%1544593,5865714514ap1971
1980445,000937,00047.5%3229617,2954015121ap1981
1990518,0001,656,00031.3%5022727,1943018922ap1991
Archdiocese of Mbarara
1999847,4501,875,45045.2%97191167,3054022025ap2000
2000853,5001,875,55045.5%105191246,8833821825ap2001
2001870,0001,880,50046.3%104141187,3724024425ap2002
2002900,0001,950,00046.2%99141137,9643726825ap2003
2003856,1682,205,86238.8%100141147,5104526625ap2004
2004901,3842,426,44837.1%95141098,2694227825ap2005

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 1 May 2014