Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anthony Peter Mayalla

Deceased

Archbishop of Mwanza, Tanzania


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Apr 1940Born
20 Dec 197030.6Ordained PriestPriest of Mwanza, Tanzania
12 Jan 197938.7AppointedBishop of Musoma, Tanzania
22 Apr 197938.9Ordained BishopBishop of Musoma, Tanzania
18 Nov 198747.5AppointedArchbishop of Mwanza, Tanzania
19 Aug 200969.3DiedArchbishop of Mwanza, Tanzania

MicroData Summary for Anthony Peter Mayalla
Archbishop Anthony Peter Mayalla (born , died ) Archbishop of Mwanza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceIbindo-Kwimba

  • a priest for 38.6 years
  • a bishop for 30.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 150, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 200, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast