Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Daniele Sansoni

Deceased

Bishop of Novigrad (Cittanova)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Jul 1655BornVenezia
18 Sep 167722.1Ordained DeaconDeacon
1679¹23.4Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 171256.9AppointedBishop of Caorle, Italy
17 Jul 171256.9Ordained BishopBishop of Caorle, Italy
14 Jun 171761.8AppointedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia
Mar 1725³69.5DiedBishop of Novigrad (Cittanova), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Daniele Sansoni:
Bishop Daniele Sansoni (born , died Mar 1725) Bishop of Novigrad (Cittanova)

  • a priest for 46.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 71, and Page 141
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1712, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 2 Jul 2015