Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Nicola Portoghese, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Syros (e Milos)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Dec 1660³BornChios
1 Oct 171049.7AppointedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
28 Dec 171050.0Ordained BishopBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
1727¹66.0DiedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Nicola Portoghese:
Bishop Nicola Portoghese O.F.M. (born , died 1727) Bishop of Syros (e Milos)

  • a bishop for 16.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 367
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 29 Jun 2015