Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vincenzo Lupi, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 May 1641Born
4 Jun 170362.0AppointedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
17 Jun 170362.1Ordained BishopBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia
3 Nov 170968.5DiedBishop of Stagno (Ston), Croatia

MicroData Summary for Vincenzo Lupi
Bishop Vincenzo Lupi O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Stagno (Ston)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRagusa

  • a bishop for 6.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 363
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,703, Number 10

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast