Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierluigi del Mayo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Isola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1685BornCosensa
21 Mar 171125.2Ordained PriestPriest
23 Sep 172236.7AppointedBishop of Isola, Italy
27 Sep 172236.8Ordained BishopBishop of Isola, Italy
2 Apr 174963.3ResignedBishop of Isola, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pierluigi del Mayo:
Bishop Pierluigi del Mayo (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Isola

Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 228
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015