Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Galisi

Deceased

Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Sep 1648BornCava
11 Dec 167224.2Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 171869.3AppointedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
30 Jan 171869.3Ordained BishopBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy
Feb 1730³81.3DiedBishop of Lettere (-Gragnano), Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Domenico Galisi:
Bishop Domenico Galisi (born , died Feb 1730) Bishop of Lettere (-Gragnano)

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 12.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 246
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015