Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Carlo Ambrogio Mezzabarba

Deceased

Bishop of Lodi

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1685BornPavia
1 May 171833.0Ordained PriestPriest
18 Sep 171934.4AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
21 Sep 171934.4Ordained BishopTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
18 Jul 172540.2AppointedBishop of Lodi, Italy
7 Dec 174156.6DiedBishop of Lodi, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Ambrogio Mezzabarba:
Patriarch Carlo Ambrogio Mezzabarba (born , died ) Bishop of Lodi

  • a priest for 23.6 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 77, and Page 238
  • c34: CB, 13 May 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 3 Mar 2014