Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gennaro Scalea

Deceased

Bishop of San Severo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 May 1670³BornTerlizzi
5 Jun 169424.0Ordained PriestPriest
24 Jan 171847.6AppointedBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
30 Jan 171847.6Ordained BishopBishop of Lacedonia, Italy
27 Feb 173665.7AppointedBishop of San Severo, Italy
18 Jul 173969.1DiedBishop of San Severo, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Gennaro Scalea:
Bishop Gennaro Scalea (born , died ) Bishop of San Severo

  • a priest for 45.1 years
  • a bishop for 21.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 236
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1718, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 377

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 1 Sep 2015