Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomaso Giustiniani, C.R.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Nebbio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1644¹BornChio
28 May 170056.4AppointedBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
20 Jun 170056.4Ordained BishopBishop of Chios (Scio), Greece
22 Jul 170965.5AppointedBishop of Nebbio, France
25 Jun 171369.4DiedBishop of Nebbio, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Tomaso Giustiniani:
Bishop Tomaso Giustiniani C.R.M. (born 1644, died ) Bishop of Nebbio

  • a bishop for 13.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 158, and Page 283
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1700, Number 15

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 May 2015