Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francesco Cammarota

Deceased

Bishop of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania

Bishop of Policastro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Feb 1874BornMaiori
1900²25.9Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 191743.8AppointedBishop of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania, Italy
19 Mar 191844.1Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania, Italy
13 Aug 192753.5AppointedBishop of Policastro, Italy
15 Dec 193561.8DiedBishop of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania, Italy

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Francesco Cammarota:
Bishop Francesco Cammarota (born , died ) Bishop of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania

  • a priest for 36.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1933
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • d: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1936
  • ob/c2: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1932
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1918, Number 16
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 111

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013