Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raymond Tapiwa Mupandasekwa, C.Ss.R.

Bishop of Chinhoyi, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1970 Born
1996²25.6EnteredMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
2001²30.6Perpetual VowsMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
4 Aug 200131.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
30 Dec 201747.6AppointedBishop of Chinhoyi, Zimbabwe
7 Apr 201847.9Ordained BishopBishop of Chinhoyi, Zimbabwe

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Raymond Tapiwa Mupandasekwa
Bishop Raymond Tapiwa Mupandasekwa C.Ss.R. (born ) Bishop of Chinhoyi

EventPlace
Birth PlaceTamirepi
Ordained BishopChinhoyi University of Technology, Chinhoyi, Diocese of Chinhoyi

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chinhoyi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2017
  • ln: CB, 14 Jan 2018
  • ob: CB, 22 Jan 2018
  • c2: CB, 31 Mar 2018
  • c34: CB, 7 Apr 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast