Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Horan, O. Carm.

Bishop of Mutare, Zimbabwe


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Oct 1962 Born
15 Oct 199532.9Perpetual VowsMember of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
7 Jun 199734.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Our Lady of Mt. Carmel
28 May 201653.6AppointedBishop of Mutare, Zimbabwe
27 Aug 201653.8Ordained BishopBishop of Mutare, Zimbabwe

MicroData Summary for Paul Horan
Bishop Paul Horan O. Carm. (born ) Bishop of Mutare

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrangan, County Tipperary, Ireland
Ordained Bishoppelouses de Marymount Teachers College, Mutare, Diocese of Mutare

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mutare.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 28 May 2016
  • ob: CB, 16 Jun 2016
  • c2: CB, 27 Aug 2016
  • c34: CB, 29 Aug 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,086

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast