Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Youannès Malak

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Luqsor {Tebe} (Coptic), Egypt

Titular Bishop of Dioclea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1916Born
25 Mar 193922.7Ordained PriestPriest
4 Nov 197862.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Luqsor {Tebe} (Coptic), Egypt
4 Nov 197862.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Dioclea
23 Mar 197962.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dioclea
198265.5ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Luqsor {Tebe} (Coptic), Egypt
12 Jan 198568.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Luqsor {Tebe} (Coptic), Egypt

MicroData Summary for Youannès Malak
Bishop Youannès Malak (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Luqsor {Tebe}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEtlidem

  • a priest for 45.7 years
  • a bishop for 5.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast