Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Herman Tillemans, M.S.C. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Merauke


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Jul 1902BornGrave
19 Aug 192826.1Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of the Sacred Heart of Jesus
25 Jun 195047.9AppointedVicar Apostolic of Merauke, Indonesia
25 Jun 195047.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Berissa
5 Nov 195048.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Berissa
15 Nov 196664.3AppointedArchbishop of Merauke, Indonesia
26 Jun 197269.9ResignedArchbishop of Merauke, Indonesia
23 Aug 197573.1DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Merauke, Indonesia

MicroData Summary for Herman Tillemans:
Archbishop Herman Tillemans M.S.C. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Merauke

  • a priest for 47.0 years
  • a bishop for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1950, Number 94

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 12 Jan 2014