Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Vincent Michael Concessao

Archbishop Emeritus of Delhi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Sep 1936 BornMangalore
4 Dec 196125.2Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 199558.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Delhi, India
3 Feb 199558.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mascula
1 Apr 199558.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mascula
5 Nov 199862.1AppointedArchbishop of Agra, India
7 Sep 200063.9AppointedArchbishop of Delhi, India
30 Nov 201276.2RetiredArchbishop of Delhi, India

MicroData Summary for Vincent Michael Concessao:
Archbishop Vincent Michael Concessao (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Delhi

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Delhi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142, Number 12,541
  • r: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013