Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Anil Joseph Thomas Couto

Archbishop of Delhi, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1954 Born
8 Feb 198126.3Ordained PriestPriest
22 Dec 200046.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Delhi, India
22 Dec 200046.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Cenculiana
11 Mar 200146.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cenculiana
24 Feb 200752.4AppointedBishop of Jullundur, India
30 Nov 201258.1AppointedArchbishop of Delhi, India

MicroData Summary for Anil Joseph Thomas Couto
Archbishop Anil Joseph Thomas Couto (born ) Archbishop of Delhi

EventPlace
Birth PlacePemburpa

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Delhi.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,928
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast